CT HB05311 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase socialization opportunities for nonambulatory nursing home residents by authorizing nursing homes to provide transportation at reasonable cost for such residents to visit nearby family and establishing a grant program within available appropriations to pay for such transportation.
Title
An Act Encouraging Socialization For Nursing Home Residents By Providing Transportation For Visits With Family.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-28 | House | File Number 131 |
2022-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 140 |
2022-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |