CT HB05311 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide telecommunications providers with the option to not file with PURA tariffs for a service offered to business retail end-users and to repeal the requirement of an annual telecommunications service status report to the General Assembly from PURA.
Title
An Act Concerning Telecommunications Provider Tariffs For Services Offered To Business Retail End Users And Certain Telecommunications Service-related Reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 401 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 405 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 81 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 405 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 81 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-20 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-20 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-16 | House | Public Act 16-101 |
2016-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-22 | House | File Number 705 |
2016-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 472 |
2016-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4267 |
2016-04-05 | House | File Number 462 |
2016-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 299 |
2016-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-17 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |