CT HB05307 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - File Number 130
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - File Number 130
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To specify that a municipal chief executive officer performs certain functions regarding firearm permits when there is no chief of police, specify that the Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection takes the fingerprints of certain out-of-state applicants for a firearm permit and eliminate the requirement that the photograph included with a form to renew a firearm permit be notarized or date stamped.
Title
An Act Concerning The Role Of Municipal Chief Executive Officers In Firearm Permitting, Taking Of Fingerprints For Certain Out-of-state Firearm Permit Applicants And Submission Of Photographs Accompanying Firearm Permit Renewals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Unfavorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Unfavorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | File Number 130 |
2022-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 139 |
2022-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |