CT HB05307 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Consumer Protection to adopt regulations to regulate sports wagering when federal law is enacted or repealed or a federal court decision is issued that affirms the authority of a state to regulate sports wagering.
Title
An Act Concerning Sports Wagering In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-30 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-30 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-04 | House | File Number 189 |
2018-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 148 |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-12 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |