CT HB05303 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) require law enforcement units to receive and maintain minimum accreditation standards developed by the Police Officer Standards and Training Council, and (2) require the chief of police or Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection to submit an annual report regarding pursuits by police officers.
Title
An Act Concerning Minimum Standards And Practices For The Administration Of Law Enforcement Units And Reports Of Police Pursuits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-05 | House | File Number 237 |
2018-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 170 |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |