CT HB05303 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - File Number 738
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - File Number 738
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the physical health of children by prohibiting or limiting the serving of sweetened beverages in child care settings, prohibiting children's access to certain electronic devices in child care settings, and increasing children's participation in daily exercise.
Title
An Act Concerning Childhood Obesity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 138 AS AMENDED (Y: 109 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | File Number 738 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 512 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2016-04-26 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-26 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4796 |
2016-04-05 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-05 | House | No New File by Committee on Education |
2016-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-04 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-29 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Education |
2016-03-22 | House | File Number 111 |
2016-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 105 |
2016-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |