CT HB05302 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-03 - Senate Calendar Number 564
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-03 - Senate Calendar Number 564
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Legislative Program Review and Investigations Committee's recommendations to require the Department of Children and Families to prepare and implement an action plan to improve the effectiveness of the department's family preservation and support programs.
Title
An Act Implementing The Program Review And Investigations Committee's Recommendations Concerning An Action Plan To Improve Family Preservation And Support Programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-03 | Senate Calendar Number 564 | |
2010-05-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-05-03 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2010-05-03 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-03 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5310 | |
2010-04-27 | File Number 650 | |
2010-04-27 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-27 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-21 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-19 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-04-13 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-07 | File Number 364 | |
2010-04-07 | House Calendar Number 197 | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-23 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-18 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |
2010-03-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-12 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-11 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Human Services | |
2010-02-26 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |