CT HB05299 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Department of Economic and Community Development's recommendations for revisions to (1) the JobsCT program, (2) the program overseen by the Community Investment Fund 2030, and (3) the approval process for economic development projects to be paid for with urban action bond funds.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Economic And Community Development's Recommendations For Revisions To The Jobsct Program And The Commerce And Related Statutes.
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | Rep. Fred Gee [D] | Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D] | Sen. Lisa Seminara [R] |
Sen. Henri Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 296 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 195 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 195 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-31 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-31 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-22 | House | Public Act 24-149 |
2024-05-08 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 479 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2024-05-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5889 |
2024-04-11 | House | File Number 442 |
2024-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 286 |
2024-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |