CT HB05296 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - File Number 317
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - File Number 317
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To define the terms "medically necessary" and "medical necessity" for the purpose of the administration of the Medicaid program.
Title
An Act Concerning The Definition Of Medical Necessity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | File Number 317 | |
2010-04-06 | House Calendar Number 172 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-06 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-23 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-05 | Public Hearing 03/11 | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |