CT HB05294 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - File Number 471
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - File Number 471
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the intentional release of certain helium balloons that become a source of litter in the landscape and waterways of the state.
Title
An Act Concerning The Intentional Release Of Certain Balloons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | File Number 471 |
2022-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 334 |
2022-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |