CT HB05294 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make technical changes to a statute regarding the Department of Veterans' Affairs.
Title
An Act Concerning The Admission Of Veterans To Hospitals And The Application Of Military Occupational Training To State Licensure Requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 427 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 181 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 181 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Public Act 14-141 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-01 | Senate | File Number 731 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 539 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2014-04-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-30 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4673 |
2014-03-25 | House | File Number 90 |
2014-03-25 | House | House Calendar Number 68 |
2014-03-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |