CT HB05287 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - File Number 129
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - File Number 129
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To move up the date that the plan for the state-wide remote learning school is due from July 1, 2023, to January 1, 2023, and to permit local and regional boards of education to authorize remote learning to students in grades kindergarten to twelve, inclusive.
Title
An Act Concerning Remote Learning In Connecticut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | File Number 129 |
2022-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 138 |
2022-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |