CT HB05287 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide that: (1) A person who is subject to a conservatorship proceeding or a proceeding concerning administration of treatment for a psychiatric disability shall not be appointed a guardian ad litem prior to a determination that such person is incapacitated, and (2) such appointment be made for limited purposes and duration established by the court.
Title
An Act Concerning The Appointment Of A Guardian Ad Litem For A Person Who Is Subject To A Conservatorship Proceeding Or A Proceeding Concerning Administration Of Treatment For A Psychiatric Disability.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Sen. Paul Doyle [D] | Sen. Edwin Gomes [D] | Sen. Toni Harp [D] |
House Judiciary Committee | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 246 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 64 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 64 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-08 | Public Act 12-25 | |
2012-05-02 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Passed | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Calendar Number 370 | |
2012-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-17 | House Passed | |
2012-04-04 | File Number 249 | |
2012-04-04 | House Calendar Number 202 | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-21 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-01 | Public Hearing 03/05 | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |