CT HB05275 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-04 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-04 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to establish the Learn Here, Live Here program, and allow funds from such program to be applied to the establishment of a new business in the state by participants in such program.
Title
An Act Concerning The Learn Here, Live Here Program And Business Creation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-25 | House | File Number 87 |
2014-03-25 | House | House Calendar Number 65 |
2014-03-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |