CT HB05272 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To expand eligibility for and consolidate existing certified historic structure rehabilitation tax credits in order to increase efficiency in the use and administration of such tax credits.
Title
An Act Consolidating Certified Historic Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-22 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-15 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-04-07 | House | File Number 401 |
2014-04-07 | House | House Calendar Number 235 |
2014-04-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |