CT HB05270 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - File Number 432
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - File Number 432
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit bid shopping, to institute new requirements for the listing of subcontractor bids for state contracts and to require that any savings obtained by substituting a subcontractor be paid to the state.
Title
An Act Prohibiting Bid Shopping.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | File Number 432 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 302 |
2018-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |