CT HB05267 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Economic and Community Development to include the arts and culture industries in the department's strategic state-wide marketing plan.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Economic And Community Development's Strategic Planning Regarding The Promotion Of Arts And Culture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 374 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 51 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 51 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act 22-98 |
2022-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2022-04-21 | House | Senate Calendar Number 408 |
2022-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-19 | House | House Passed |
2022-03-21 | House | File Number 49 |
2022-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 84 |
2022-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |