CT HB05266 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a Green Alert system for missing veterans.
Title
An Act Establishing A Green Alert System For Missing Veterans.
Sponsors
House Veterans' Affairs Committee | Rep. Kurt Vail [R] | Rep. Tami Zawistowski [R] | Sen. Eric Berthel [R] |
Sen. John Kissel [R] | Rep. Robin Green [R] | Rep. Holly Cheeseman [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |