CT HB05265 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - File Number 293
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - File Number 293
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to issue a request for proposals for the development of a computer or mobile application to promote student career awareness and STEM skill development for middle school students in the state.
Title
An Act Requiring The Issuance Of A Request For Proposals For A Career And Stem Computer Or Mobile Application For Students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | File Number 293 |
2022-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 223 |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-30 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |