CT HB05253 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To limit disclosure of records relating to participation in the gaming voluntary self-exclusion process.
Title
An Act Concerning Disclosure Of Gaming Voluntary Self-exclusion Records And Allowing Single-use Stored Value Instruments To Be Used To Fund Certain Keno And Lottery Accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 365 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 194 AS AMENDED (Y: 130 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 194 AS AMENDED (Y: 130 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 22-113 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 560 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2022-05-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4911 |
2022-04-13 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-13 | House | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2022-03-22 | House | File Number 77 |
2022-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 99 |
2022-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |