CT HB05252 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To: (1) Expand enforcement of the Connecticut Antitrust Act, and (2) harmonize discovery procedures utilized by the Office of the Attorney General when handling antitrust, whistle-blower and false claims cases.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To The Connecticut Antitrust Act And Discovery Conducted By The Attorney General In Whistle-blower And False Claims Actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 278 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 65 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 65 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-15 | House | Public Act 18-22 |
2018-05-08 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | House | Senate Passed |
2018-04-26 | House | Senate Calendar Number 428 |
2018-04-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Passed |
2018-04-18 | House | File Number 562 |
2018-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 374 |
2018-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-05 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |