CT HB05245 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To establish a task force to study best practices to provide transportation for disabled persons, senior citizens and veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Best Practices For Providing Transportation For Persons With Disabilities, Senior Citizens And Veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 273 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 54 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseSigned by the Governor
2018-05-17HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2018-05-17HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2018-05-15HouseSpecial Act 18-3
2018-05-08HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2018-05-08HouseSenate Passed
2018-04-23HouseSenate Calendar Number 381
2018-04-23HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-19HouseHouse Passed
2018-03-28HouseFile Number 66
2018-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 80
2018-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-15HouseJoint Favorable
2018-03-02HousePublic Hearing 03/08
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Aging

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback