CT HB05243 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Public Health to administer the Connecticut School Health Survey to students in high schools; to require school personnel to complete training when a student in the school has been the victim of abuse by an adult; to require the Department of Children and Families to develop or adopt bystander training, appropriate interaction with children training, investigative training and victim sensitivity training programs; to extend the statute of limitations for failure to report as a mandated reporter from one year to three years; to authorize the Department of Education to suspend an educator's teaching license if an allegation of abuse or neglect has been substantiated; to require school districts and child care providers to conduct investigations of allegations of abuse or neglect in accordance with a checklist developed by the Department of Children and Families; to require the Department of Education and the Office of Early Childhood to develop a screening checklist for the hiring of prospective employees; and to make such training programs available to youth-serving and religious organizations.
Title
An Act Concerning The Identification And Prevention Of And Response To Adult Sexual Misconduct Against Children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 380 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 44 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 49 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 45 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 44 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 49 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 45 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act 22-87 |
2022-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-18 | House | File Number 514 |
2022-04-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 374 |
2022-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-13 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 4619 |
2022-04-13 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4630 |
2022-04-04 | House | File Number 274 |
2022-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 206 |
2022-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |