CT HB05239 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To eliminate qualifying income limits for veterans in order to be eligible for certain municipal option tax exemptions.
Title
An Act Concerning Eligibility For Certain Veterans' Property Tax Exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 365 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 137 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 137 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-22 | House | Public Act 18-102 |
2018-05-09 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Passed |
2018-05-02 | House | Senate Calendar Number 476 |
2018-05-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-30 | House | House Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-09 | House | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-06 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-03 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2018-03-28 | House | File Number 64 |
2018-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 78 |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |