CT HB05238 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - File Number 63
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - File Number 63
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To aid veterans and members of the armed forces by improving identification of their mental health needs and directing resources accordingly.
Title
An Act Concerning Mental Health Resources For Veterans And Members Of The Armed Forces.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | File Number 63 |
2018-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 77 |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |