CT HB05233 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To specify that requests for Military Department records that are required to be generated and maintained by federal law are made under and processed pursuant to the federal Freedom of Information Act, not the state Freedom of Information Act.
Title
An Act Concerning Recordkeeping Duties Of The Adjutant General.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 366 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 164 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 164 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Public Act 18-104 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 485 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-05-02 | House | House Passed |
2018-04-10 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-10 | House | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-03 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2018-03-26 | House | File Number 41 |
2018-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 61 |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |