CT HB05232 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 486
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 486
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) update the Insurers Rehabilitation and Liquidation Act to reflect provisions in the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act, (2) provide that a transfer pursuant to a commutation of a reinsurance agreement shall not be voidable as a preference, (3) specify limits on when a party to a netting agreement or qualified financial contract with an insolvent insurer may exercise such party's right to terminate, liquidate, accelerate or close out obligations with respect to such agreement or contract, and (4) delete an obsolete provision concerning insurer receivership and make a conforming change.
Title
An Act Concerning The Insurers Rehabilitation And Liquidation Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 107 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 486 |
2016-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-22 | House | House Passed |
2016-03-24 | House | File Number 174 |
2016-03-24 | House | House Calendar Number 139 |
2016-03-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |