CT HB05231 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
Pending: Joint Planning and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
Pending: Joint Planning and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit municipalities to provide a freeze on property taxes for disabled veterans that meet certain qualifications.
Title
An Act Providing For A Freeze On Property Taxes For Qualified Disabled Veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2018-04-03 | House | File Number 147 |
2018-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 118 |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |