CT HB05230 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To strengthen standards for interpreters for deaf, deafblind and hard of hearing persons.
Title
An Act Concerning Standards For Interpreters For Deaf, Deafblind And Hard Of Hearing Persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 294 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 107 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 107 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Public Act 22-31 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 504 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | House Passed |
2022-04-26 | House | Rules Suspended |
2022-04-26 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-26 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-20 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-11 | House | File Number 378 |
2022-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 270 |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |