CT HB05230 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-23 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-23 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the installation of certain types of smoke detectors and carbon monoxide detectors in single-family homes.
Title
An Act Concerning Smoke Detectors In The Solid Waste Stream.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-23 | House | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2024-04-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-23 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-04-16 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2024-04-08 | House | File Number 326 |
2024-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 221 |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |