CT HB05226 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To limit recovery of public assistance payments by the state except as required under federal law or a court-ordered support payment.
Title
An Act Limiting State Recovery Of Public Assistance Payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-20 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2022-04-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2022-03-22 | House | File Number 63 |
2022-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 92 |
2022-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |