CT HB05220 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - File Number 106
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - File Number 106
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To exclude certain persons from the definition of obligor.
Title
An Act Concerning Obligors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | File Number 106 |
2022-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 109 |
2022-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |