CT HB05219 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - File Number 45
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - File Number 45
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Banking to submit recommendations for various revisions to the banking statutes to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to banking.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To The Banking Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | File Number 45 |
2022-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 80 |
2022-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |