CT HB05213 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require payments from the State Fire Administrator to volunteer fire companies that respond to calls on limited access highways and certain other locations.
Title
An Act Concerning Payments To Volunteer Fire Companies For Responding To Calls On Limited Access Highways And At Certain Other Locations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | House | Bill Passed Temporarily |
2022-05-03 | House | House Designated House Amendment Schedule A 6257 |
2022-04-26 | House | File Number 630 |
2022-04-26 | House | House Calendar Number 473 |
2022-04-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 5:00 PM |
2022-04-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2022-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |