CT HB05213 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To expand required health insurance coverage for hearing aids to individuals older than twelve years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Expanding Required Health Insurance Coverage For Hearing Aids.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 418 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 209 AS AMENDED (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24HousePublic Act 19-133
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-28HouseFile Number 998
2019-05-28HouseSenate Calendar Number 619
2019-05-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-23HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-23HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8789
2019-04-02HouseFile Number 269
2019-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 175
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
2019-03-07HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-01HousePublic Hearing 02/07
2019-01-24HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-11HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback