CT HB05212 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To allow certain business entities to claim the manufacturing apprenticeship tax credit against the personal income tax.
Title
An Act Extending The Manufacturing Apprenticeship Tax Credit To Pass-through Entities.
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | Rep. Christine Conley [D] | Rep. Kate Rotella [D] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] |
Rep. Dorinda Keenan Borer [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |