CT HB05210 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the state's Penal Code to specify that forgery of a written instrument includes forgery of any paper or electronic vaccination card or record indicating the date on which a person received a vaccination against COVID-19.
Title
An Act Concerning Forgery Of A Written Instrument Indicating Vaccination Against Covid-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-27 | House | No New File by Committee on Public Health |
2022-04-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-27 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-20 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health |
2022-04-11 | House | File Number 377 |
2022-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 268 |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-30 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-24 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |