CT HB05206 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To remove impediments to timely financial relief for senior citizens and persons with disabilities.
Title
An Act Concerning The Renters' Rebate Program For Senior Citizens And Persons With Disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |