CT HB05205 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) incorporate revisions made by the National Association of Insurance Commissioners to its Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Model Act into the Connecticut Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act, and (2) make other changes to the Connecticut Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act.
Title
An Act Concerning The Connecticut Life And Health Insurance Guaranty Association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 269 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 39 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 39 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-14 | House | Public Act 18-13 |
2018-05-08 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | House | Senate Passed |
2018-04-13 | House | Senate Calendar Number 311 |
2018-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-11 | House | House Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | File Number 145 |
2018-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 116 |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |