CT HB05204 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To modify the "Standard Fire Insurance Policy of the State of Connecticut" to require an allowance for the cost to repair or replace a covered building in accordance with applicable ordinances and laws, provided such allowance shall not exceed ten per cent of the cost of the covered building.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Law And Ordinance Coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 370 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 169 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06SenateSigned by the Governor
2018-05-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2018-05-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2018-05-22SenatePublic Act 18-105
2018-05-09SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2018-05-09SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-09SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-03SenateFile Number 669
2018-05-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 495
2018-05-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-05-02SenateImmediate Transmittal to the Senate
2018-05-02HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-02HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4399
2018-04-09HouseFile Number 309
2018-04-09HouseHouse Calendar Number 204
2018-04-09HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-09HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-02HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM
2018-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-20HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-02-23HousePublic Hearing 02/27
2018-02-22HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback