CT HB05202 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To provide an exemption to existing nuclear power generating facilities in the state from the nuclear power facility construction moratorium.
Title
An Act Exempting Existing Nuclear Power Generating Facilities In The State From The Nuclear Power Facility Construction Moratorium.
Sponsors
House Energy and Technology Committee | Rep. Holly Cheeseman [R] | Rep. Mark Anderson [R] | Sen. Paul Formica [R] |
Sen. Ryan Fazio [D] | Rep. Kathleen McCarty [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 361 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 221 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 32 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 222 (Y: 126 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 221 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 32 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 222 (Y: 126 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act 22-76 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 568 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2022-05-03 | House | House Passed |
2022-05-03 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 6471 |
2022-04-07 | House | File Number 372 |
2022-04-07 | House | House Calendar Number 262 |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |