CT HB05199 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize extended periods of probation following conviction for certain crimes against minors.
Title
An Act Concerning Probation Periods Following Conviction For Certain Sexual Misconduct Crimes Against Minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |