CT HB05185 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To permit certain unmarried persons under the age of twenty-one to be appointed a guardian solely in connection with a petition to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services for designation of the person as having special immigrant juvenile status.
Title
An Act Concerning Guardianship Appointments For Individuals Seeking Special Immigrant Juvenile Status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 315 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 43 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 62 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 44 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 43 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 62 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 44 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-22 | House | Public Act 18-92 |
2018-05-09 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-04-20 | House | File Number 621 |
2018-04-20 | House | Senate Calendar Number 372 |
2018-04-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-04-18 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 3749 |
2018-04-18 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3428 |
2018-04-12 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-12 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-15 | House | File Number 8 |
2018-03-15 | House | House Calendar Number 36 |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-01 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |