CT HB05183 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the charging of a fee for a cremation permit for the cremation of a deceased person who was under the age of eighteen.
Title
An Act Concerning The Fee For A Cremation Permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |