CT HB05182 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-22 - File Number 703
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-22 - File Number 703
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To exempt leased municipal property from taxation.
Title
An Act Exempting Leased Municipal Property From Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 66 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | House | File Number 703 |
2016-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 481 |
2016-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4323 |
2016-03-21 | House | File Number 59 |
2016-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 76 |
2016-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |