CT HB05180 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To enable funeral directors to offer catered food and beverages to persons attending funeral services.
Title
An Act Concerning The Provision Of Catered Food And Beverages In Funeral Homes.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Rep. Nicole Klarides-Ditria [R] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] |
Rep. Tom Arnone [D] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |