CT HB05176 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require a study of the powers, duties, benefits and classification of first responders.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of The Powers, Duties, Benefits And Classification Of First Responders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-18 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-16 | House | File Number 28 |
2022-03-16 | House | House Calendar Number 55 |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-18 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |