CT HB05173 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - File Number 351
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To limit the scope of voter registration information available to certain entities and prohibit certain uses of such information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Protecting The Privacy Of Voters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseFile Number 351
2018-04-10HouseHouse Calendar Number 225
2018-04-10HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-10HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-03HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-26HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-23HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/26
2018-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback