CT HB05171 | 2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require municipal tax collectors to waive interest on delinquent property tax payments if such delinquency is attributable to an error made by the tax assessor or tax collector, and not the result of any action or failure on the part of the taxpayer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Waiver Of Interest On Certain Delinquent Property Tax Payments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 329 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 106 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-30HouseSigned by the Governor
2024-05-28HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2024-05-28HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2024-05-20HousePublic Act 24-90
2024-05-08HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2024-05-08SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2024-05-08SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2024-05-02SenateFile Number 647
2024-05-02SenateSenate Calendar Number 409
2024-05-02SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2024-04-30HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2024-04-30HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4222
2024-03-12HouseFile Number 4
2024-03-12HouseHouse Calendar Number 31
2024-03-12HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2024-03-12HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2024-03-06HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/24 5:00 PM
2024-03-04HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2024-03-01HouseJoint Favorable
2024-02-16HousePublic Hearing 02/21
2024-02-15HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB05171&which_year=2024
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/TOB/H/PDF/2024HB-05171-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/TOB/H/PDF/2024HB-05171-R01-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/ACT/PA/PDF/2024PA-00090-R00HB-05171-PA.PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/lcoamd/pdf/2024LCO04222-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/amd/H/pdf/2024HB-05171-R00HA-AMD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/FN/PDF/2024HB-05171-R000004-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/BA/PDF/2024HB-05171-R000004-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/fna/pdf/2024HB-05171-R00LCO04222-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/FN/PDF/2024HB-05171-R01-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/BA/PDF/2024HB-05171-R01-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/FN/PDF/2024HB-05171-R010647-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/BA/PDF/2024HB-05171-R010647-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/SUM/PDF/2024SUM00090-R02HB-05171-SUM.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/TS/H/PDF/2024HB-05171-R00PD-CV19-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/VOTE/H/PDF/2024HV-00106-R00HB05171-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/VOTE/S/PDF/2024SV-00329-R00HB05171-SV.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback