CT HB05171 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Senate Reconsidered, Veto Sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Senate Reconsidered, Veto Sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit the Governor from making rescissions to a town's education cost sharing grant during the fiscal year.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Executive Branch From Making Rescissions Or Other Reductions To The Education Cost Sharing Grant During The Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 316 RECONSIDERATION (Y: 101 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 317 REPASSAGE (Y: 103 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 399 REPASS (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 371 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 166 AS AMENDED (Y: 117 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 317 REPASSAGE (Y: 103 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 399 REPASS (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 371 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 166 AS AMENDED (Y: 117 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Senate Reconsidered, Veto Sustained |
2018-06-25 | House | Senate Reconsidered |
2018-06-25 | House | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Veto Overruled, House |
2018-06-25 | Senate | House Reconsidered |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Public Act 18-35 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-03 | Senate | File Number 680 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 496 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-05-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4585 |
2018-04-03 | House | File Number 142 |
2018-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 113 |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |